IL SB2863 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
CHILD CARE-FEE-LICENSE-FINE
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Michael Bond [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Christine Radogno [R] |
Sen. Dale Righter [R] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 | |
2010-05-27 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-05-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000 | |
2010-05-27 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Bond | |
2010-05-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive | |
2010-05-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-05-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 26, 2010 | |
2010-05-21 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-05-07 | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 117-000-000 | |
2010-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-05-07 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2010-05-07 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-05-06 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee | |
2010-05-06 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-05-06 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-06 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2010-05-06 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2010-05-05 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-05-05 | Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-04-28 | Do Pass / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 004-002-001 | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2010-04-22 | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-22 | First Reading | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-04-22 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2010-04-16 | Arrived in House | |
2010-04-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 040-007-000 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff | |
2010-04-15 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2010-03-25 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2010-03-25 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2010-03-19 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 17, 2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-08 | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 | |
2010-02-25 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading | |
2010-01-28 | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2010-01-28 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |