IL SB2854 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Except for provisions with references to a committeeman and committeewoman, changes references from "committeeman" to "committeeperson" and makes related changes throughout the Code. Changes references from "chairman" to "chairperson" and makes related changes throughout the Code. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-GENDERED REFERENCES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-23HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bush
2018-04-18SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Government Reform; 008-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Government Reform
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2018
2018-02-28SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 008-000-000
2018-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10510-10Amended CodeCitation Text
10510-2Amended CodeCitation Text
10510-6.2Amended CodeCitation Text
10510-8Amended CodeCitation Text
10510-9Amended CodeCitation Text
10511-6Amended CodeCitation Text
10513-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10513-1.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10513-2Amended CodeCitation Text
10513-3Amended CodeCitation Text
10513-4Amended CodeCitation Text
10514-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10514-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10514-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text
10514-5Amended CodeCitation Text
10517-18.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10517-22Amended CodeCitation Text
10517-23Amended CodeCitation Text
10518-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10518-14Amended CodeCitation Text
1051A-6Amended CodeCitation Text
1051A-6.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1051A-7Amended CodeCitation Text
10521-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10522-1Amended CodeCitation Text
10522-15Amended CodeCitation Text
10522-15.1Amended CodeCitation Text
10522-4Amended CodeCitation Text
10522-8Amended CodeCitation Text
10524-13Amended CodeCitation Text
10524A-10Amended CodeCitation Text
10524A-11Amended CodeCitation Text
10524A-15Amended CodeCitation Text
10524B-10Amended CodeCitation Text
10524B-11Amended CodeCitation Text
10524B-15Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-13Amended CodeCitation Text
10524C-15Amended CodeCitation Text
10525-11Amended CodeCitation Text
10525-6Amended CodeCitation Text
10528-13Amended CodeCitation Text
10529B-10Amended CodeCitation Text
10529B-20Amended CodeCitation Text
10529B-25Amended CodeCitation Text
10529B-30Amended CodeCitation Text
1052A-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1054-11Amended CodeCitation Text
1054-12Amended CodeCitation Text
1054-22Amended CodeCitation Text
1054-6.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1055-14Amended CodeCitation Text
1055-15Amended CodeCitation Text
1055-16.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1055-29Amended CodeCitation Text
1056-24Amended CodeCitation Text
1056-44Amended CodeCitation Text
1056-50.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1056-60Amended CodeCitation Text
1056-66Amended CodeCitation Text
1056-70Amended CodeCitation Text
1056A-3Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-1Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-10Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-11Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-12Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-13Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-14.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-17Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-19Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-2Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-25Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-34Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-4Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-46Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-51Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-53Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-55Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-56Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-58Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-59Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-60Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-60.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-7Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-8Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-8.01Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-8.02Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-9Amended CodeCitation Text
1057-9.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1058-5Amended CodeCitation Text
1058-6Amended CodeCitation Text
1058-7Amended CodeCitation Text
1059-1.3Amended CodeCitation Text
1059-1.8Amended CodeCitation Text
1059-11Amended CodeCitation Text
1059-15Amended CodeCitation Text
1059-2Amended CodeCitation Text
1059-20Amended CodeCitation Text
1059-8.10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback