IL SB2846 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Private College Act and the Academic Degree Act. Provides that a nonprofit institution owned, controlled, and operated and maintained by a bona fide church, religious denomination, or religious organization comprised of multi-denominational members of the same well-recognized religion, lawfully operating as a nonprofit religious corporation pursuant to the Religious Corporation Act, is exempt from the Acts if (i) the education is limited to instruction in the principles of that church, religious denomination, or religious organization or to courses offered for the purpose of training the adherents of that church, religious denomination, or religious organization in the care of the sick in accordance with its religious tenets and (ii) the diploma or degree is limited to evidence of completion of that education and the meritorious recognition upon which any honorary degree is conferred is limited to the principles of that church, religious denomination, or religious organization. Sets forth requirements and prohibitions concerning the awarding of degrees and diplomas by such an institution. Requires the institution to annually file with the Board of Higher Education evidence to demonstrate its status as a nonprofit religious corporation under the Religious Corporation Act. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
PRIVATE COLLEGE-RELIGIOUS DEG
Sponsors
Sen. William Haine [D] | Rep. Frank Mautino [D] | Rep. David McSweeney [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-005-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2014-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Haine |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Higher Education |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 8, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 1005 | 1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 1010 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |