IL SB2838 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Open Meetings Act. Authorizes an elected or appointed member of a public body of a park district, forest preserve district, or conservation district to satisfy the training requirements of the Act through an alternative training arrangement sponsored or conducted by the Illinois Association of Park Districts. Sets forth requirements for the alternative course of training. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OPEN MEETINGS PARKS TRAINING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-13SenateSession Sine Die
2014-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2014-03-21SenatePostponed - Executive; Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
2014-02-27SenateTo Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
2014-02-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2014-02-11SenateAssigned to Executive
2014-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2014-01-30SenateFirst Reading
2014-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51201.05Amended CodeCitation Text
51204Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback