IL SB2786 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2016, tangible personal property used in the construction or operation of a new or existing data center that has been granted a certificate of exemption by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity is exempt from the taxes imposed under those Acts. Amends the Electricity Excise Tax Law. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2016, business enterprises that are certified as qualifying Illinois data centers by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity are exempt from the taxes imposed under the Act. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois to provide for certification of qualified data centers. Effective immediately.
Title
USE TAX-DATA CENTERS
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-03-10 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (RV) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-333 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 640 | 2-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2786&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2786.htm |