IL SB2779 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate End of Life Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate End of Life Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and the Autopsy Act. Provides that autopsies must be performed by board-certified forensic pathologists or, if under the direct supervision of a board-certified forensic pathologist, pathology residents or forensic pathology fellows (rather than a licensed physician must perform autopsies). In the Autopsy Act, further provides that other qualified personnel or other qualified personnel selected by a board-certified forensic pathologist (rather than a physician) may perform (rather than assist) an autopsy. Further amends the Counties Code. Provides that a county in which the body of a deceased person is found shall indemnify and hold harmless a board-certified forensic pathologist who renders services under the provisions for all of the pathologist's conduct arising out of the pathologist's testimony as an expert witness in a criminal proceeding based on the service provided under the provisions, except actions involving willful and wanton misconduct of the pathologist. Conditions the duty of the county to indemnify a board-certified forensic pathologist who rendered services under the provisions for a judgment recovered against the pathologist upon receiving notice of the filing of the action. Provides that, if a board-certified forensic pathologist is made a party defendant to an action and the action against the pathologist is based upon the pathologist's conduct arising out of the pathologist's testimony as an expert witness in a criminal proceeding, then, within 10 days of service of process, the pathologist shall notify the county in which the body of a deceased person was found of the fact that the pathologist has been made a party defendant to the action. Includes requirements for the notice. Provides that the State's Attorney of the county in which the body of the deceased person is found may appear and defend on behalf of the board-certified forensic pathologist. Effective immediately.
Title
CNTY-BD-CERTIFIED PATHOLOGISTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on End of Life Issues |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on End of Life Issues |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Doris Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 505 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 505 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 505 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-3014 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-3016 | Amended Code | Citation Text |