IL SB2776 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATORY SUNRISE REVIEW ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Althoff
2018-05-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-10SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54301-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback