IL SB2771 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Deletes the January 1, 2015 sunset of the eavesdropping exemption that permits with prior request to and verbal approval of the State's Attorney of the county in which the conversation is anticipated to occur, recording or listening with the aid of an eavesdropping device to a conversation in which a law enforcement officer, or any person acting at the direction of a law enforcement officer, is a party to the conversation and has consented to the conversation being intercepted or recorded in the course of an investigation of a drug offense. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-EAVESDROPPING-SUNSET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2014-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 14-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |