IL SB2769 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Legislative Commission Reorganization Act of 1984. Provides that the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability shall create a Veteran Internship Pilot Program for the purpose of providing internships for honorably discharged veterans to participate in the General Assembly's legislative staff internship program. Provides that, subject to appropriation, beginning on July 1, 2024, the Commission shall implement the pilot program. Provides that the Commission shall operate the pilot program for a 2-year period. Provides that, at the end of that 2-year period, the Commission shall evaluate the pilot program and submit a report to the General Assembly with its findings. Provides that the Commission shall establish qualifications for participation in the pilot program, including that a participant must be honorably discharged from the United States Armed Forces and have completed at least 60 hours of college credit. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2027. Effective immediately.
Title
VETERAN INTERNSHIP PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |