IL SB2761 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0670
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois Department of Transportation Law. Extends the repeal date of the target market program from June 30, 2014 to June 30, 2017. Effective immediately.
Title
TARGET MARKET PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0670 |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Effective Date June 27, 2014 |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-001 |
2014-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 015-000-001 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-04-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Executive; |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |