IL SB2747 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0695
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0695
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act and the School Code. Creates the School Security and Standards Task Force within the State Board of Education to study the security of schools in this State, make recommendations, and draft minimum standards for use by schools to make them more secure and to provide a safer learning environment for the children of this State. Sets forth provisions concerning the membership of the Task Force, meetings of the Task Force, State Board support for the Task Force, and the duties of the Task Force. Provides that, on or before January 1, 2015, the Task Force shall submit a report to the General Assembly and the Governor on specific recommendations for changes to the current law or other legislative measures. Provides that, on or before January 1, 2015, the Task Force shall submit a report to the State Board on specific recommendations for model security plan policies for schools to access and use as a guideline, which report is exempt from inspection and copying under the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that the Task Force is abolished and these provisions are repealed on July 1, 2015. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOL SECURITY TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0695 |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Effective Date July 3, 2014 |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2014-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2014-04-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2014-02-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2014 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.160 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |