IL SB2745 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. Provides that the required sign shall provide the name and phone number of an authorized State alcoholism and substance abuse helpline.
Title
LIQUOR-RETAIL SIGNAGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 012-000-000 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-24a | Amended Code | Citation Text |