IL SB2743 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Private Business and Vocational Schools Act of 2012. Provides that a school or program within a school that exclusively provides yoga instruction, yoga teacher training, or both is not considered to be a private business and vocational school.
Title
PRIVATE BUSINESS/VOC SCHOOLS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Rep. Daniel Burke [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] |
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0705 |
2016-07-29 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-29 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2016-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-04-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 426 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |