IL SB2708 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2024, the additional standard exemption for taxpayers who have attained the age of 65 before the end of the taxable year and their spouses is $2,000 (currently, $1,000). Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-STANDARD EXEMPTION
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2708&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2708.htm |