IL SB2698 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that each taxpayer who employs a long-term unemployed person during the taxable year is entitled to an income tax credit of: (1) $500 in the taxable year in which the long-term unemployed person is initially hired by the taxpayer; (2) $750 in the first taxable year after the long-term unemployed person is initially hired by the taxpayer; and (3) $1,250 in the second taxable year after the long-term unemployed person is initially hired by the taxpayer. Provides that the taxpayer may receive a partial credit if the person is employed by the taxpayer for only part of a taxable year. Provides that the credit may be carried forward. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CREDIT-UNEMPLOYED
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-16 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2014-04-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2014-04-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2014 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bertino-Tarrant |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 012-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 012-000-000 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |