IL SB2696 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a school district or a school bus company under contract with a school district shall not operate a Type I or Type II school bus manufactured after the effective date of the bill unless the bus is equipped with a set of 3-point seat belts or any other federally approved restraint system in good operating condition for each passenger seat and a rooftop safety hatch. Provides that, on or after January 1, 2028, all newly purchased school buses shall be equipped with 3-point seat belts or any other federally approved restraint system in good operating condition for each passenger. Provides that the provision shall not apply to a school bus that is legally registered in another state and displaying valid registration plates of that state if the bus is not operated in Illinois on a regular basis and the bus is operated in Illinois in connection with a cultural, tourist, athletic, or other similar activity for students enrolled in a school located outside of the State. Provides that nothing in the provision shall make a school district or a school bus company liable for a passenger's failure to properly adjust or fasten a seat belt or other restraint system. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-SCHOOL BUS-SEAT BELTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2696&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2696.htm |