IL SB2683 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Stalking No Contact Order Act. Defines a course of conduct to include using any electronic tracking system or acquiring tracking information to determine a targeted person's location, moment, or travel patterns. Requires an order under this Act to prohibit this course of conduct.
Title
STALKING NO CONTACT-TRACKING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0760 |
2024-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2024-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernández |
2024-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2024-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 21 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 21 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |