IL SB2675 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0881
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0881
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the purpose of the Act.
Title
PROCUREMENT-HUBZONE CONTRACTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0881 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-011-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fowler |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |