IL SB2674 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Adds the Poison Response Fund. Amends the Wireless Emergency Telephone Safety Act. Provides that human poison control centers constitute an enhancement to 9-1-1 services pursuant to federal law. Provides that for surcharges collected and remitted on or after July 1, 2014, $0.1275 per surcharge collected shall be deposited into the Wireless Carrier Reimbursement Fund, $0.5825 per surcharge collected shall be deposited into the Wireless Service Emergency Fund, $0.02 per surcharge shall be deposited in the Poison Response Fund, and $0.01 per surcharge collected may be disbursed to the Illinois Commerce Commission for administrative costs. Requires the Auditor General to conduct an annual audit of the Poison Response Fund. Permits the Commission to require an annual report of income and expenditures from each human poison control center. Extends the date of repeal of the Act to July 1, 2018 (currently July 1, 2013). Creates the Poison Response Fund. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Extends the repeal of certain Sections relating to 9-1-1 system providers until July 1, 2016 (currently July 1, 2015). Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOVT-POISON CONTROL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2014-05-20 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-20 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-05-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-013-001 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-002-000 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2014 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Sue Rezin |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 13-1200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 13-900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 13-900.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 13-900.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.855 | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 751 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 751 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 751 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 751 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 751 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |