IL SB2653 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Third Reading - Lost; 021-027-002
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - Third Reading - Lost; 021-027-002
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Bridge Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
VEH CD-HOLDING ANIMAL IN LAP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 21 N: 27 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Lost; 021-027-002 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sandoval |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sandoval |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 006-001-000 |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 007-003-000 |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2012 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 26, 2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 23, 2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-01-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-01-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 115 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |