IL SB2626 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that, in anticipation of the successful completion of a diversion program, a petitioner may file a petition for expungement at least 61 days before the anticipated dismissal of the case. Provides that, if a petition is filed, and upon the successful completion of the diversion program and dismissal of the case, the court shall review the petition and shall grant expungement if the petitioner meets all requirements. Amends the Drug Court Treatment Act, the Veterans and Servicemembers Court Treatment Act, and the Mental Health Court Treatment Act to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM ID ACT-EXPUNGEMENT FILING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07SenateSent to the Governor
2024-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
2024-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2024-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2024-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
2024-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2024-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
2024-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2024-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
2024-05-09SenatePassed Both Houses
2024-05-09HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2024-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2024-05-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000
2024-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
2024-04-24HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2024-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
2024-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2024-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
2024-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
2024-04-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
2024-04-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2024-04-17HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2024-04-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
2024-04-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2024-04-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2024-04-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2024-04-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2024-04-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2024-04-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-04-15HouseFirst Reading
2024-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
2024-04-12HouseArrived in House
2024-04-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2024-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2024
2024-04-11SenateSecond Reading
2024-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2024-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
2024-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000
2024-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
2024-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2024-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2024-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
2024-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2024-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
2024-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2024-03-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2024-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2024-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
2024-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2024-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2024-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
2024-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2024-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci
2024-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2024-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2024
2024-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000
2024-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2024-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
2024-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2024-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
2024-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2024-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2024-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
2024-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2024-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
2024-02-21SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Ann Gillespie
2024-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
2024-01-24SenateAssigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
2023-10-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-10-25SenateFirst Reading
2023-10-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text
73016635Amended CodeCitation Text
73016735Amended CodeCitation Text
73016835Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback