IL SB2624 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that an employee who is required to travel in connection with his or her employment and who suffers an injury while in travel status shall be eligible for benefits only if the injury arises out of and in the course of employment while he or she is actively engaged in the duties of employment. Defines "accident" and "injury". Provides that "injury" includes the aggravation of a pre-existing condition by an accident arising out of and in the course of the employment, but only for so long as the aggravation of the pre-existing condition continues to be the major contributing cause of the disability. Provides that an injury resulting directly or indirectly from idiopathic causes is not compensable. Further provides that, with respect to the computation of compensation to be paid to an employee who had previously sustained an injury resulting in payment of compensation for partial disability for injuries not involving serious and permanent disfigurement and injuries for which the Act provides a schedule of benefits, the amount of the prior award for the partial disability with respect to the same portion of the body shall be deducted. Limits cumulative awards for partial disability to 500 weeks, which shall constitute a complete loss of use of the body as a whole. Provides that no employer shall be required to pay temporary partial disability benefits to an employee who has been discharged for cause. Provides that injuries to the shoulder are deemed to be injuries to the arm and injuries to the hip are deemed to be injuries to the leg. Provides for the computation of compensation when there are multiple employers and when there is less than full-time work. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WORKER COMP-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-13SenateSession Sine Die
2014-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2014-03-05SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (LC)
2014-02-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2014-01-29SenateAssigned to Labor and Commerce
2014-01-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood
2013-12-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2013-12-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2013-12-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2013-11-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2013-11-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld
2013-11-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy
2013-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2013-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2013-11-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2013-11-08SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christine Radogno
2013-11-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2013-11-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-11-07SenateFirst Reading
2013-11-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8203051Amended CodeCitation Text
82030510Amended CodeCitation Text
8203058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback