IL SB2622 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall maintain all unfounded reports, with some exceptions, for 12 months following the date of a final finding. Provides that unfounded reports may only be made available to the subject of the report, provided the Department has not expunged the file in accordance with certain provisions of the Act (rather than provided that the subject requests the report within 60 days of being notified that the report was unfounded). Effective immediately.
Title
DCFS-UNFOUNDED REPORTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1164 | |
2010-07-21 | Effective Date July 21, 2010 | |
2010-07-21 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2010-03-11 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2010 | |
2010-02-18 | Second Reading | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading | |
2010-01-21 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |