IL SB2620 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0942
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0942
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a combination sewer cleaning jetting vacuum truck registered as a Special Hauling Vehicle, used exclusively for the transportation of non-hazardous solid waste, may, when laden, transmit upon the road surface, except when on part of the National System of Interstate and Defense Highways, the greater of the gross vehicle weight of the truck or: 22,000 pounds on a single axle; 40,000 pounds on a tandem axle; 54,000 pounds gross weight on a 3-axle vehicle; 66,000 pounds gross weight on a 4-axle vehicle. Provides that these vehicles are not limited to 3 axles.
Title
SPECIAL HAULING VEHICLES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0942 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-05-05 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | First Reading |
2014-05-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2014-05-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sandoval |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 5-1(b)(1), Senator Hutchinson to present the bill on 3rd Reading. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-11-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 15-111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |