IL SB2620 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires that if a political committee does not make the good faith effort required to ascertain the occupation and employer of a campaign contributor of more than $500 within 30 days after receiving the contribution, then the committee must return to the contributor the amount in excess of $500. Effective January 1, 2011.
Title
ELECTIONS-CONTRIBUTION REPORTS
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Cronin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-17 | To Executive Subcommittee on Campaign Finance | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading | |
2010-01-21 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2620&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2620.htm |