IL SB2610 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that no municipality, county, or road district that received distributions under this subsection (e) totaling more than $1,000,000 in the previous State fiscal year shall receive a future distribution of motor fuel tax moneys unless that municipality, county, or road district implements a business enterprise program setting goals for the inclusion of minority, veteran, and female-owned businesses in the procurement of contracts. Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall assist municipalities, counties, and road districts in implementing those programs. Effective immediately.
Title
DOT-ROAD FUND
Sponsors
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 45 N: 37 NV: 19 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-11-15 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 045-037-011 |
2018-11-15 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-11-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted |
2018-11-15 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-11-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-11-07 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-004-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-05-25 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-001-001 |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-615 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |