IL SB2607 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a State policeman who meets the requirements of the Tier 2 provisions is entitled to an annuity calculated under the alternative retirement annuity provisions of the State Employee Article of the Code in lieu of the regular or minimum retirement annuity only if the person has withdrawn from service with not less than 20 years of eligible creditable service and has attained age 50 (instead of age 60), regardless of whether the attainment of age 50 (instead of age 60) occurs while the person is still in service. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply without regard to whether a person is in active service on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-TIER 2 STATE POLICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |