IL SB2588 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Third Reading - Lost; 023-019-004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Third Reading - Lost; 023-019-004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom from Drone Surveillance Act. Provides that: a law enforcement agency may use a drone for law enforcement training purposes; training must be completed in a geographically confined and time-limited manner to safeguard the privacy of individuals; the use of a drone on private property requires lawful consent; the use of a drone on land, highways, roadways, or areas belonging to the State or political subdivisions of the State does not require a search warrant or consent to search; a law enforcement agency shall make every reasonable attempt to photograph only the law enforcement training and avoid other areas or individuals; provides that a supervisor at a law enforcement agency may retain information gathered by a drone used for law enforcement training purposes; and a supervisor of a law enforcement agency who uses a drone for law enforcement training purposes may disclose particular information to another government agency. Effective immediately.
Title
DRONE SURVEILLANCE-EXCEPTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 23 N: 19 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Lost; 023-019-004 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Muñoz |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-001-003 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 167 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 167 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 167 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |