IL SB2587 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0930
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0930
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Telehealth Act. Provides that "health care professionals" includes dentists.
Title
TELEHEALTH ACT-DENTIST
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] |
Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Rep. Mike Fortner [R] | Rep. Monica Bristow [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0930 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-04-20 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 150 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |