IL SB2578 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cook County Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if a person certified by a medical doctor to be under legal disability (i) has no spouse, blood relative, or other person providing or caring for him or her, (ii) has no guardian of his or her estate, and (iii) is confined to a Medicare approved, State certified nursing home or to a publicly owned and operated nursing home, hospital, or mental institution, the Board may pay any benefit due that person to the nursing home, hospital, or mental institution, to be used for the sole benefit of the person under legal disability. Provides that the payment to a person, nursing home, hospital, or mental institution for the benefit of a minor or person under legal disability shall be an absolute discharge of the Fund's liability with respect to the amount so paid. Requires any person, nursing home, hospital, or mental institution accepting that payment to notify the Fund of the death or any other relevant change in the status of the minor or person under legal disability. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-COOK-PAYEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0794 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-001 |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 9-228 | Amended Code | Citation Text |