IL SB2574 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police and Downstate Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, for the 2-year period consisting of taxable years 2010 and 2011, the city council or the board of trustees of the municipality shall annually levy a tax upon all the taxable property of the municipality at the rate on the dollar that will produce an amount for that 2-year period that is the lesser of: (i) the amount levied for taxable year 2009 multiplied by 1.1 or (ii) an amount that, when added to the deductions from the salaries or wages of police officers and firefighters and revenues available from other sources, will equal a sum sufficient to meet the annual actuarial requirements of the pension funds. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ART 3&4-FINANCING-LEVY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Pensions and Investments | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 009-000-000 | |
2010-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Cronin | |
2010-02-23 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Pensions and Investments | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading | |
2010-01-13 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2574&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2574.htm |