IL SB2566 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $578,000 to the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority for costs associated with the Creating Healing of Inside Community Educators program at Pinckneyville and Menard Correctional Centers. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
$ICJIA-CREATING HEALING
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Sen. Willie Preston [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Rachel Ventura [D] |
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2566&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/PDF/10300SB2566.pdf |