IL SB2561 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Requires an individual or group policy of accident and health insurance that provides telehealth services to provide reimbursement for such services at the same rate that such services are reimbursed for an in-person consultation and to reimburse a facility fee to the originating site. Allows the Director of Insurance to alter the dollar amount of this facility fee, and requires the Director to review the amount of the fee at least once every 5 years. Defines "originating site". Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that services provided through telehealth shall be reimbursed at the same rate that such services are reimbursed for an in-person consultation. Effective immediately.
Title
INS-TELEHEALTH REIMBURSEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(c-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 016-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |