IL SB2560 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0927
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0927
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that persons engaged in the activity of publishing on a website or in print criminal record information must remove the information free of charge within 30 days after a request by the subject of the information. Sets forth qualifications under which a person who is subject to the criminal record information is eligible for the removal of the information. Provides that failure to comply with a request for removal constitutes an unlawful practice. (Current law prohibits the solicitation of payment to remove criminal record information.)
Title
PUBLISHING CRIMINAL RECORDS
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0927 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 066-050-000 |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000 |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-002-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Stadelman |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 007-004-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2QQQ | Amended Code | Citation Text |