IL SB2554 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that "general funds" or "State general funds" as used under the Act includes the Pension Stabilization Fund. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that for fiscal year 2022 and subsequent fiscal years, any transfers into the Budget Stabilization Fund may be transferred to the General Revenue Fund in order for the Comptroller to address outstanding vouchers, and shall not be subject to repayment into the Budget Stabilization Fund if the bill backlog as determined by the Comptroller on June 30 of that fiscal year exceeds $4,000,000,000. Amends the Budget Stabilization Act. Modifies provisions concerning requirements for and transfers into the Budget Stabilization Fund and the Pension Stabilization Fund regarding the State's backlog of bills. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-BUDGET STABILIZATION
Sponsors
Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] |
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 20 | 50-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 122 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 122 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2554&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2554.htm |