IL SB2546 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Provides that the term "student" within the definition of "educational employee" or "employee" as used in the Act includes (rather than excludes) graduate students who are teaching assistants primarily performing duties that involve the delivery and support of instruction and all other graduate students. Effective immediately.
Title
EDU LABOR ACT-EMPLOYEE DEFN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-30 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Extended Debate - Passed 066-049-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Extended Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-05-30 | House | Home Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-05-30 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-29 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2018-05-29 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2018-05-29 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2018-05-29 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2018-05-29 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2018-05-29 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2018-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-28 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-28 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-28 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-28 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-28 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-28 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-28 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-28 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-05-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-21 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 015-010-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-019-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 010-004-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Labor |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |