IL SB2521 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that a dealer or other creditor shall not use electronic tracking technology or starter interrupt technology in connection with the credit sale, loan, or lease of a motor vehicle unless the technology is used solely to verify and maintain the operational status of the tracking technology, to locate the vehicle for repossession, to repossess the vehicle, or to locate the vehicle to service the account or keep the account current. Requires specified conditions to be met and certain written disclosures to be made to the consumer regarding the use of the technology. Contains provisions regarding: use of the technology in a criminal investigation; damages for violations; repossession; privacy, storage, and destruction of data; and other matters. Provides that specified violations are unlawful practices within the meaning of the Act
Title
CONS FRAUD-STARTER INTERRUPT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-002-000 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |