IL SB2520 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Boat Registration and Safety Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
BOAT REGISTRATION-NUMBERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 45 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |