IL SB2517 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Summit Public Library District Tax Levy Validation (2011) Act. Validates levy ordinances and tax extensions to the extent they do not exceed the maximum amount authorized under the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law if the District had taken into account the tax increment value from the expiration of the West Summit TIF. Amends the Property Tax Code to make the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law subject to the Summit Public Library District Tax Levy Validation (2011) Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC LIBRARY-LEVY VALIDATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-10-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-10-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2517&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB2517.htm |