IL SB2511 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a back-up lamp equipped on a motor vehicle shall emit a white or amber light without glare. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
VEH CD-BACKUP LAMP-AMBER LIGHT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0707 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 12-209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |