IL SB2506 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that the Department of Human Rights shall administratively close specified types of charges that are pending before the Department if the issues that are the basis of the charge are being litigated in court or another administrative forum. Corrects a grammatical error.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-CHARGE PROCEDURES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2016-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Righter |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Righter |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 7-109.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |