IL SB2502 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Phase Out Corporate Giveaways Interstate Compact. Enters into the compact, which may be entered into by any state and the District of Columbia, in which each member state agrees not to offer or provide any company-specific tax incentive or company-specific grant to any entity for a corporate headquarters, manufacturing facility, office space, or other real estate development located in any other member state as an inducement for the corporate headquarters, manufacturing facility, office space, or other real estate development to relocate to the offering member state. Defines terms. Excludes: (1) workforce development grants that train employees; (2) company-specific tax incentives or company-specific grants from local governments; and (3) specified company-specific tax incentives or company-specific grants related to companies already within the member state. Creates the Phase Out Corporate Giveaways Board and provides for membership and meeting requirements. Provides for withdrawal of a member state with a 6-month written notice to each member state's chief executive officer. Contains construction and severability provisions.
Title
CORPORATE GIVEAWAYS COMPACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (RE) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2502&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2502.htm |