IL SB2499 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the medical assistance program shall provide coverage for routine care costs that are incurred in the course of an approved clinical trial if the medical assistance program would provide coverage for the same routine care costs not incurred in a clinical trial. Defines "approved clinical trial" to mean a phase I, II, III, or IV clinical trial involving the prevention, detection, or treatment of cancer or any other life-threatening disease or condition. Defines "routine care cost" to mean the cost of medically necessary services related to the care method that is under evaluation in a clinical trial, including the cost of services related to the detection and treatment of any complications arising from the patient's medical care and any complications related to participation in the clinical trial. Defines other terms.
Title
MEDICAID-CLINICAL TRIALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 18, 2020 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |