IL SB2496 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0656
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0656
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. Removes the changes made to the Collateral Recovery Act. Effective immediately.
Title
COLLATERAL RECOVERY-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0656 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2021 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2021 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-001-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-17 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 422 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 422 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 422 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 422 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 422 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |