IL SB2495 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Religious Freedom Protection and Civil Union Act. Provides that a child welfare agency that is religiously based or owned by, operated by, or affiliated with a bona fide religious organization may decline an adoption or foster family home application, including any related licensure and placement, from a party to a civil union if acceptance of that application would constitute a violation of the organization's sincerely held religious beliefs and, if an agency declines an application, it must provide the applicant with information on how to contact the Department of Children and Family Services to obtain information concerning other regional licensed child welfare agencies. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV UNION-RELIGIOUS-ADOPT AGCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Held in Executive; Subcommittee on Civil Rights |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-02-09 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Civil Rights |
2012-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Larry K. Bomke |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine J. Johnson |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzi Schmidt |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ron Sandack |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Shane Cultra |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Johnson |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-10-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-10-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-10-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2495&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB2495.htm |