IL SB2493 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act. Provides that a group health plan or a health insurance issuer offering group or individual health insurance coverage may not impose any preexisting condition exclusion. Makes conforming changes, including removing a cross-reference in the Illinois Insurance Code. Effective immediately.
Title
INSURANCE-PREEXISTING CONDITN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-23 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2010 | |
2010-04-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2010-03-24 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2010-03-23 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-03-23 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-03-23 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-03-19 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 26, 2010 | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2010 | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 11, 2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000 | |
2010-03-08 | Postponed - Executive | |
2010-03-05 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 19, 2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Re-assigned to Executive | |
2010-02-24 | Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Insurance | |
2010-02-04 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-01-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-10-29 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-29 | First Reading | |
2009-10-29 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2493&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2493.htm |