IL SB2488 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0875
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0875
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Local Library Act and the Public Library District Act of 1991. Provides that a nonresident fee shall not be charged to a nonresident who owns or leases property that is taxed for library service (rather than only the owner of taxable property) upon the presentation of the most recent tax bill upon that taxable property or a copy of the commercial lease of that taxable property (rather than only the most recent tax bill). Removes the limitation of nonresident privileges for only one nonresident for each parcel of taxable property. Effective immediately.
Title
LIBRARIES-NONRESIDENT FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0875 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date August 14, 2018 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-02-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 21, 2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 16 | 30-55.60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
75 | 5 | 4-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |