IL SB2479 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Expands the informant testimony provisions from capital cases to first degree murder, intentional homicide of an unborn child, second degree murder, voluntary manslaughter of an unborn child, involuntary manslaughter and reckless homicide, involuntary manslaughter and reckless homicide of an unborn child, drug-induced homicide, aggravated criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, or aggravated arson. Provides that the court may permit the prosecution to disclose its intent to introduce the testimony of an informant with less notice than the 30-day notice period required, if the court finds that the informant was not known prior to the 30-day notice period and could not have been discovered or obtained by the exercise of due diligence by the prosecution prior to the 30-day notice period. Provides that upon good cause shown, the court may set a reasonable notice period under the circumstances or may continue the trial on its own motion to allow for a reasonable notice period, which motion shall toll the speedy trial period for the period of the continuance. Provides that if a lawful recording of an incriminating statement is made of an accused to an informant or of a statement made by an informant to law enforcement or the prosecution, including any deal, promise, inducement, or other benefit offered to the informant, the accused may request a reliability hearing and the prosecution shall be subject to the disclosure requirements. Makes other changes.
Title
CRIM PRO-INFORMANT TESTIMONY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-010-000 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-002-000 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 115-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |