IL SB2470 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that no expedited application shall be accepted or processed for a corrected or duplicate certificate of title that seeks to remove a lienholder unless the applicant surrenders the last issued certificate of title with a completed lien release on the certificate of title. Provides that an expiration date of December 31 of the year in which the lien is satisfied shall be included on each certificate of title. Provides that if a recorded lienholder does not reaffirm a lien and does not respond to a request to verify a lien release letter within 7 calendar days of receipt, the Secretary of State shall process an application for corrected title for the owner of a motor vehicle. Provides that upon extending or refinancing a loan against a passenger motor vehicle of the first division or a motor vehicle of the second division weighing no more than 12,000 pounds, the Secretary may issue a dealer lien release and affirmation of loan certificate of title to a financial institution, or to a lienholder registered in this State that is listed on the certificate of title, that submits an application for title. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
VEH CD-TITLE REAFFIRMATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-821 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2470&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2470.htm |