IL SB2460 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that the Trauma Center Medical Directors or the Trauma Center Medical Directors Committee shall consider Level III Trauma Centers in the types of facilities that can care for certain patients. Provides that Level II and Level III Trauma Centers shall have some essential services available in-house, 24 hours per day and other essential services readily available. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall have the authority to establish and enforce minimum standards for designation and re-designation of 3 levels of trauma centers that meet trauma center national standards. Provides that the Department shall renew trauma center designations every 4 years (instead of every 2 years). Creates provisions concerning Level III Trauma Center and Acute Injury Stabilization Center minimum standards. Authorizes the Department to impose fines on Acute Injury Stabilization Centers. Prohibits facilities from holding themselves out as Acute Injury Stabilization Centers without first obtaining that designation. Requires the Department to appoint an advisory council that shall be charged with making recommendations for pediatric care needs. Removes provisions concerning certain grants from the Department to EMS systems and trauma centers. Requires the Department to designate applicant hospitals that meet the minimum standards established by the Department for pediatric emergency and critical care capabilities. Makes changes to the membership of the State Trauma Advisory Council. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to exempt from disclosure certain information received by the Department. Makes other changes. Effective 270 days after becoming law.
Title
EMS-TRAUMA CARE
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 50 | 3.100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 50 | 3.110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |